EP4188861 - HOSE REEL FOR FLAT FLEXIBLE HOSE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FITT S.p.A. Via Piave 8 36066 Sandrigo (VI) / IT | [2023/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEZZALIRA, Alessandro 36066 Sandrigo (VI) / IT | [2023/23] | Representative(s) | Autuori & Partners S.R.L. Strada del Megiaro, 261 36100 Vicenza (VI) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2023/23] | Autuori & Partners Strada del Megiaro, 261 36100 Vicenza (VI) / IT | Application number, filing date | 22740992.7 | 27.06.2022 | [2023/23] | WO2022IB55944 | Priority number, date | IT20210016907 | 28.06.2021 Original published format: IT202100016907 | [2023/23] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023275708 | Date: | 05.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4188861 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B65H75/40, B65H75/44, B65H75/24 | [2023/23] | CPC: |
B65H75/24 (EP);
B65H75/4471 (EP);
B65H2701/332 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/23] | Title | German: | SCHLAUCHTROMMEL FÜR EINEN FLACHEN FLEXIBLEN SCHLAUCH | [2023/23] | English: | HOSE REEL FOR FLAT FLEXIBLE HOSE | [2023/23] | French: | DÉVIDOIR DE TUYAU POUR TUYAU SOUPLE PLAT | [2023/23] | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2023 | Examination requested [2023/23] | 03.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US1245491 (MONTGOMERY BEAUCHAMP H [CA]) [A] 1-21 * page 1, line 107 - page 2; figure - *; | [XDAI]US2071731 (CRAIG JAMES A, et al) [XD] 1-4,8,9,13 * page 3, column l, line 28 - column r, line 62; figure - * [A] 5-7,10-12,15-17 [I] 14,18-21; | [XAI]US2426984 (CRAIG JAMES A) [X] 1-4,8,9,14,21 * figure - * [A] 5-7,15-17 [I] 10-13,18-20; | [A]JPS5922262U (-) [A] 1-21* figures 1,2 *; | [XAI]JPS638269U (-) [X] 1-4,8-10,14-18 * figure - * [A] 5-7 [I] 11-13,19-21; | [XAI]JPH01117184 (ASHIMORI IND CO LTD) [X] 1-4,8,9,13,18,21 * figures 1,2,5 * [A] 10-12,15-17 [I] 5-7,14,19,20 |