Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
25.09.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] |
19.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] |
19.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] |
29.03.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] |
29.03.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] |
29.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
27.10.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] |
27.10.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 29.11.2023 [2023/48] |
06.10.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
28.08.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.08.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
22.08.2023 | Change - representative | |
22.08.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
29.07.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
29.07.2022 | New entry: applicant or inventor |