EP4283511 - INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD AND DEVICE, SERVER AND USER EQUIPMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 23.10.2024 [2024/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALIBABA GROUP HOLDING LIMITED Fourth Floor, One Capital Place P.O. Box 847 George Town, Grand Cayman / KY | [2023/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZOU, Chenjun Hangzhou, Zhejiang 311121 / CN | [2023/48] | Representative(s) | Finnegan Europe LLP 1 London Bridge London SE1 9BG / GB | [2023/48] | Application number, filing date | 22742210.2 | 20.01.2022 | [2023/48] | WO2022CN72913 | Priority number, date | CN20211099097 | 25.01.2021 Original published format: CN202110099097 | [2023/48] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022156731 | Date: | 28.07.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4283511 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 28.07.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/11, G06F30/20, G06F16/00, G06Q30/00, G06N3/09, G06F30/27, G06F119/06 | [2024/43] | CPC: |
G06F17/11 (EP,US);
G06F30/20 (CN);
G06N7/00 (US);
G06F16/00 (EP);
G06F17/15 (CN);
G06F30/27 (EP);
G06Q10/04 (EP);
G06Q10/067 (EP);
G06Q30/0242 (EP);
G06Q30/0251 (EP);
G06Q30/0631 (EP);
G06F2111/10 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2023/48] | G06F30/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/48] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG, SERVER UND BENUTZERGERÄT | [2023/48] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD AND DEVICE, SERVER AND USER EQUIPMENT | [2023/48] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, SERVEUR ET ÉQUIPEMENT D'UTILISATEUR | [2023/48] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2023 | Translation filed | 22.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2023 | Search fee paid | 22.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CN109447277 (XIAMEN YUANTING INFORMATION TECH CO LTD); | [X]US2020097853 (GOLOVIN DANIEL REUBEN [US], et al); | [A]CN111325356 (UNIV SICHUAN); | [A]US2020382388 (PARTHASARATHY SRINIVASAN [US], et al); | [PX]CN112784418 (ALIBABA GROUP HOLDING LTD) | by applicant | CN20211099097 |