EP4281912 - HANDLING SYSTEM-CHARACTERISTICS DRIFT IN MACHINE LEARNING APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.10.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.07.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Snowflake Inc. Suite 3A, 106 East Babcock Street Bozeman, Montana 59715 / US | [2023/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOSTAKIS, Orestis Bozeman, Montana 59715 / US | 02 /
JIANG, Qiming Bozeman, Montana 59715 / US | 03 /
JIANG, Boxin Bozeman, Montana 59715 / US | [2023/48] | Representative(s) | Betten & Resch Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Maximiliansplatz 14 80333 München / DE | [2023/48] | Application number, filing date | 22743036.0 | 18.01.2022 | [2023/48] | WO2022US12789 | Priority number, date | US202117154928 | 21.01.2021 Original published format: US202117154928 | [2023/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022159391 | Date: | 28.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4281912 | Date: | 29.11.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.07.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06N20/00, G06F16/14, G06F16/28, G06F16/16 | [2024/25] | CPC: |
G06F16/285 (EP);
G06N20/00 (EP,US);
G06F16/14 (EP);
G06F16/164 (EP);
G06F16/24 (US)
|
Former IPC [2023/48] | G06N20/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/48] | Title | German: | HANDHABUNG DER DRIFT VON SYSTEMEIGENSCHAFTEN IN MASCHINENLERNANWENDUNGEN | [2023/48] | English: | HANDLING SYSTEM-CHARACTERISTICS DRIFT IN MACHINE LEARNING APPLICATIONS | [2023/48] | French: | GESTION DE LA DÉRIVE DES CARACTÉRISTIQUES D'UN SYSTÈME DANS DES APPLICATIONS D'APPRENTISSAGE AUTOMATIQUE | [2023/48] | Entry into regional phase | 18.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 18.08.2023 | Search fee paid | 18.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2017330109 (MAUGHAN JASON [US], et al); | [A]US2020183936 (RAMESH BHASHYAM [IN], et al); | International search | [Y]US2020082296 (FLY EDWARD ALEXANDER [US], et al); | [Y]US2020183936 (RAMESH BHASHYAM [IN], et al) |