EP4367302 - PROCESS FOR SPINNING ALKALINE CELLULOSE SPIN DOPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.01.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | 06.09.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TreeToTextile AB P.O.Box 190 101 23 Stockholm / SE | [2024/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEDLUND, Artur 411 27 GÖTEBORG / SE | 02 /
HAGSTRÖM, Bengt 413 18 GÖTEBORG / SE | [2024/20] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [2024/20] | Application number, filing date | 22744168.0 | 04.07.2022 | [2024/20] | WO2022EP68459 | Priority number, date | EP20210183794 | 05.07.2021 Original published format: EP 21183794 | EP20210212307 | 03.12.2021 Original published format: EP 21212307 | [2024/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023280779 | Date: | 12.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4367302 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | D01D4/02, D01D5/06, D01F2/00, D01F2/02, D01D1/02 | [2024/20] | CPC: |
D01D4/02 (EP,US);
D01D5/06 (EP,US);
D01D1/02 (EP);
D01D5/253 (US);
D01F2/00 (EP);
D01F2/02 (EP,US);
D10B2201/20 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/20] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM SPINNEN EINER ALKALISCHEN ZELLULOSESPINNLÖSUNG | [2024/20] | English: | PROCESS FOR SPINNING ALKALINE CELLULOSE SPIN DOPE | [2024/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FILAGE D'UNE SOLUTION DE FILAGE DE CELLULOSE ALCALINE | [2024/20] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/20] | 25.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]US3865918 (MITCHELL REID L, et al); | [YA]CN107354518 (UNIV QINGDAO); | [A]US2019062950 (HEDLUND ARTUR [SE], et al) | by applicant | WO2010104458 | WO2015000820 | WO2017178532 | WO2018169479 | WO2020171767 |