EP4286072 - INORGANIC COATED SAND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | 05.04.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kao Corporation 14-10, Nihonbashi-Kayabacho 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8210 / JP | [2023/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AONUMA, Hiroaki Toyohashi-shi, Aichi 441-8074 / JP | 02 /
NAKANE, Keisuke Toyohashi-shi, Aichi 441-8074 / JP | [2023/49] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2023/49] | Application number, filing date | 22745685.2 | 19.01.2022 | [2023/49] | WO2022JP01786 | Priority number, date | JP20210012896 | 29.01.2021 Original published format: JP 2021012896 | JP20210207414 | 21.12.2021 Original published format: JP 2021207414 | [2023/49] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022163464 | Date: | 04.08.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4286072 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B22C1/10, B22C1/18 | [2023/49] | CPC: |
B22C1/188 (EP);
B22C1/02 (EP);
B22C1/10 (EP);
B22C1/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/49] | Title | German: | ANORGANISCHER BESCHICHTETER SAND | [2023/49] | English: | INORGANIC COATED SAND | [2023/49] | French: | SABLE ENDUIT INORGANIQUE | [2023/49] | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2023 | Translation filed | 09.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2023 | Search fee paid | 09.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS342257B (MIIHANAITO METAL CORPORATION) [X] 1-6 * p. 1, right column, lines 6-8, p. 3, left column, lines 8-22, table 1 *; | [X]JPS49130824 (ASHLAND OIL, INC) [X] 1-2, 4-5 * p. 7, lower left column, line 17 to p. 12, lower right column, line 16 *; | [X]JP2005059081 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP, et al) [X] 1-2, 4-5 * claims 1, 5, paragraph [0025], table 1 *; | [X]JP2008511447 (AS LUENGEN GMBH) [X] 1-6* claims 1, 6, paragraphs [0028], [0034] * | by applicant | JP2014117740 | WO2015194550 |