EP4265428 - AUXILIARY TAPE CASSETTE, PRINTING TAPE CASSETTE, AND PRINTING CASSETTE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | 05.04.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BROTHER KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 15-1 Naeshiro-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8561 / JP | [2023/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HIGASHI, Kosuke Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8562 / JP | 02 /
MURAYAMA, Kentaro Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8562 / JP | [2023/47] |
Former [2023/43] | 01 /
HIGASH Kosuke Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8562 / JP | ||
02 /
MURAYAMA Kentaro Nagoya-shi, Aichi 467-8562 / JP | Representative(s) | Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte Sohnckestraße 12 81479 München / DE | [2023/43] | Application number, filing date | 22745738.9 | 21.01.2022 | [2023/43] | WO2022JP02144 | Priority number, date | JP20210013361 | 29.01.2021 Original published format: JP 2021013361 | [2023/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022163517 | Date: | 04.08.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4265428 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B41J17/32, B41J15/04 | [2023/43] | CPC: |
B41J15/044 (EP);
B41J32/00 (US);
B41J17/32 (EP);
B41J3/4075 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/43] | Title | German: | ZUSATZBANDKASSETTE, DRUCKBANDKASSETTE UND DRUCKKASSETTE | [2023/43] | English: | AUXILIARY TAPE CASSETTE, PRINTING TAPE CASSETTE, AND PRINTING CASSETTE | [2023/43] | French: | CASSETTE DE BANDE AUXILIAIRE, CASSETTE DE BANDE D'IMPRESSION ET CASSETTE D'IMPRESSION | [2023/43] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2023 | Translation filed | 20.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2023 | Search fee paid | 20.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS63156762U [A] 1-12; | [A]JPH071254 (ESSELTE DYMO NV) [A] 1-12 * entire text, all drawings *; | [A]US5843270 (BUERGIN MARKUS [CH]) [A] 1-12 * entire text, all drawings *; | [A]JP2003276290 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * entire text, all drawings *; | [A]WO2020203180 (BROTHER IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-12 * entire text, all drawings *; | [PA]WO2021065465 (BROTHER IND LTD [JP]) [PA] 1-12* entire text, all drawings * | by applicant | JP2010234772 |