EP4284507 - METHODS OF TREATING OCULAR FIBROTIC PATHOLOGIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | 05.04.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mayo Foundation for Medical Education and Research 200 First Street S.W. Rochester, Minnesota 55905 / US | [2023/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAAK, Andrew J. Rochester, Minnesota 55902 / US | 02 /
TSCHUMPERLIN, Daniel J. Rochester, Minnesota 55906 / US | 03 /
BAKRI, Sophie Rochester, Minnesota 55902 / US | [2023/49] | Representative(s) | Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Straße 8 80807 München / DE | [2023/49] | Application number, filing date | 22746586.1 | 27.01.2022 | [2023/49] | WO2022US14045 | Priority number, date | US202163143525P | 29.01.2021 Original published format: US 202163143525 P | [2023/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022164996 | Date: | 04.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4284507 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.08.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61P27/02, C07K16/18, A61K39/39 | [2023/49] | CPC: |
A61P27/02 (EP);
C07D311/04 (US);
C07D221/08 (US);
C07D401/10 (US);
C07D405/04 (US);
C07D405/10 (US);
C07D407/04 (US);
C07D471/04 (US);
C07D491/052 (US);
C07D491/16 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/49] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON FIBROTISCHEN AUGENERKRANKUNGEN | [2023/49] | English: | METHODS OF TREATING OCULAR FIBROTIC PATHOLOGIES | [2023/49] | French: | MÉTHODES DE TRAITEMENT DE PATHOLOGIES FIBROTIQUES OCULAIRES | [2023/49] | Entry into regional phase | 28.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 28.08.2023 | Search fee paid | 28.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/49] | 29.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]US5591884 (DENINNO MICHAEL P [US], et al) [Y] 4 * ; coll col138 * [A] 10, 17/10, 18/17/10,19/17/10, 20/17/10; | [XA]US2009247483 (MITCHELL CLAIRE [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * ; Abstract para[0136] * [A] 10, 17/10, 18/17/10, 19/17/10, 20/17/10; | [XYA]US2019151270 (ASHBY REGAN [AU]) [X] 1-2, 17/1, 18/17/1,19/17/1, 20/17/1 * ; para[0020] para[0077] para[0078] para[0091] para[0094] para[0110] para[0112] * [Y] 4 [A] 10, 17/10, 18/17/10,19/17/10 and 20/17/10; | [PA]WO2021021922 (MAYO FOUND MEDICAL EDUCATION & RES [US]) [PA] 1-4, 10, 17/1, 17/10,18/17/1, 18/17/10,19/17/1, 19/17/10,20/17/1, 20/17/10* ; entire document * |