EP4369940 - CHOCOLATE FREE FROM DAIRY COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.01.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Puratos NV Industrialaan 25 1702 Groot-Bijgaarden / BE | [2024/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OYMAN PERKOZ, Sena 1950 Kraainem / BE | 02 /
DEBERTRAND, Agathe 1030 Schaerbeek / BE | 03 /
PAREYT, Bram 9770 Kruisem / BE | [2024/21] | Representative(s) | De Clercq & Partners Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | [2024/21] | Application number, filing date | 22747032.5 | 15.07.2022 | [2024/21] | WO2022EP69832 | Priority number, date | BE20210005555 | 16.07.2021 Original published format: BE 202105555 | [2024/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023285643 | Date: | 19.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4369940 | Date: | 22.05.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A23G1/44, A23G1/48 | [2024/21] | CPC: |
A23G1/44 (EP,KR);
A23G1/48 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MILCHPRODUKTFREIE SCHOKOLADE | [2024/21] | English: | CHOCOLATE FREE FROM DAIRY COMPONENTS | [2024/21] | French: | CHOCOLAT EXEMPT DE COMPOSANTS LAITIERS | [2024/21] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/21] | 07.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CN105594947 (JIESHOU AOYUAN FOOD CO LTD); | [A]KR20170074783 (BOBSUN CO [KR], et al); | [A]WO2018167788 (PANDA VEGAN PRODUCTS LTD [IL]); | [A]US2018295849 (EARL DAVID [US], et al); | [A]JP2019165737 (IMPOSSIBLE FOODS INC); | [A]WO2020065207 (ROQUETTE FRERES [FR]); | [A]WO2020116565 (FUJI OIL HOLDINGS INC [JP], et al); | [A]WO2020127358 (NESTLE SA [CH]); | [A]CN112056443 (UNIV QINGDAO); | [A]US2021051975 (SHMULEWITZ ASCHER [IL], et al); | [AP]WO2021259812 (NESTLE SA [CH]); | [AP]WO2022006194 (CARGILL INC [US]); | by applicant | US10555543 |