Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP4363963 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP4363963



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






All documents(14)
Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 395
30.07.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
30.07.2024 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
30.07.2024 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
30.07.2024 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
30.07.2024 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
10.04.2024 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
06.02.2024 Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
25.01.2024 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
25.01.2024 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
15.01.2024 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 8
23.01.2023 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 125
23.01.2023 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 129
05.01.2023 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 2
05.01.2023 Published international application - A1 Search / examination 107