EP4363448 - METHOD OF RECONSTITUTING LYOPHILIZED FORMULATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | 06.09.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amgen Inc. One Amgen Center Drive Thousand Oaks, CA 91320-1799 / US | [2024/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QI, Wei Thousand Oaks, CA 91320-1799 / US | 02 /
REN, Cindy Thousand Oaks, CA 91320-1799 / US | [2024/19] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [2024/19] | Application number, filing date | 22747526.6 | 29.06.2022 | [2024/19] | WO2022US35533 | Priority number, date | US202163216616P | 30.06.2021 Original published format: US 202163216616 P | [2024/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023278585 | Date: | 05.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4363448 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, C07K16/30, A61K39/395, A61P35/00 | [2024/19] | CPC: |
C07K16/28 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K39/39591 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K47/10 (KR);
A61K47/183 (KR);
A61K9/0019 (KR);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL,KR);
C07K16/2809 (EP,IL,KR);
C07K16/2878 (EP,IL);
C07K16/3092 (EP,IL);
A61K9/19 (KR);
C07K2317/31 (EP,IL,KR);
C07K2317/622 (EP,IL);
C07K2317/94 (EP,IL,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/19] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR WIEDERHERSTELLUNG EINER LYOPHILISIERTEN FORMULIERUNG | [2024/19] | English: | METHOD OF RECONSTITUTING LYOPHILIZED FORMULATION | [2024/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE RECONSTITUTION D'UNE FORMULATION LYOPHILISÉE | [2024/19] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/19] | 12.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 06.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]WO2017021349 (AMGEN RES (MUNICH) GMBH [DE]); | [XI]WO2018204907 (AMGEN INC [US]); | [X]WO2019020745 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al); | [XI]WO2019133961 (AMGEN INC [US], et al); | [I]WO2020072306 (AMGEN INC [US]); | by applicant | US4439196 | US4447224 | US4447233 | US4475196 | US4486194 | US4487603 | US4596556 | US4751180 | WO8809344 | US4790824 | US4935233 | US4941880 | US5064413 | US5312335 | US5383851 | US5399163 | US2002103345 | WO2006020258 | WO2009032782 |