Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20240027701 | Global Dossier | 04.03.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2022US35533 | 29.06.2022 | US202163216616 | 30.06.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2024525482 | Global Dossier | 12.07.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2022US35533 | 29.06.2022 | US202163216616 | 30.06.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL308847 | Global Dossier | 01.01.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2022US35533 | 29.06.2022 | US202163216616 | 30.06.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN117377695 | Global Dossier | 09.01.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2022US35533 | 29.06.2022 | US202163216616 | 30.06.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3220933 | Global Dossier | 05.01.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2022US35533 | 29.06.2022 | US202163216616 | 30.06.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2022304662 | Global Dossier | 30.11.2023 | A9 | AU2022304662 | 23.11.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2022US35533 | 29.06.2022 | US202163216616 | 30.06.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4363448 | Global Dossier | 08.05.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2022US35533 | 29.06.2022 | US202163216616 | 30.06.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2023014859 | 17.01.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2022US35533 | 29.06.2022 | US202163216616 | 30.06.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2023278585 | Global Dossier | 05.01.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202163216616 | 30.06.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CL2023003713 | 21.06.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202163216616 | 30.06.2021 |