EP4359782 - ULTRASENSITIVE, ULTRATHIN VAPOR SENSORS AND ARRAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.12.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | 30.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trace Sensing Technologies Inc. 55 Barnes Park Road North Wallingford, CT 06492 / US | [2024/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GREGORY, Otto J. Narragansett, Rhode Island 02882 / US | 02 /
RICCI, Peter P. Warwick, Rhode Island 02893 / US | [2024/18] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2024/18] | Application number, filing date | 22747545.6 | 21.06.2022 | [2024/18] | WO2022US73061 | Priority number, date | US202117356392 | 23.06.2021 Original published format: US202117356392 | US202217659909 | 20.04.2022 Original published format: US202217659909 | [2024/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022272249 | Date: | 29.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4359782 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/14, G01N33/00 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
G01N27/14 (EP);
G01N25/488 (US);
A61B5/6833 (US);
G01N25/4893 (EP);
G01N33/0031 (EP);
G01N33/4975 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/18] | Title | German: | ULTRASENSITIVE ULTRADÜNNE DAMPFSENSOREN UND ANORDNUNGEN | [2024/18] | English: | ULTRASENSITIVE, ULTRATHIN VAPOR SENSORS AND ARRAYS | [2024/18] | French: | CAPTEURS DE VAPEUR ULTRA-MINCES ULTRASENSIBLES ET RÉSEAUX | [2024/18] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/18] | 15.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9947905 (CYRANO SCIENCES INC [US], et al) [Y] 16 * figure 1 *; | [XD]US9759699 (GREGORY OTTO J [US], et al) [XD] 19 * fig. 15 and corresponding text passage col. 10, l. 47 ff *; | [Y]US2017276627 (DOBROKHOTOV VLADIMIR [US], et al) [Y] 9,18 * [04227] *; | [XAYI]US2018313800 (ROGERS BEN [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,10,12,20,23,25,28-31,38,39,47 * the whole document * [A] 34,35 [Y] 9,11,16,18,21,24 [I] 2,8,13-15,26,27,32,33,42,43,45,46,48,49; | [XP]US2022146481 (RICCI PETER P [US], et al) [XP] 1-11,13,17-19,36-49* the whole document *; | [Y] - "thick in the air", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, THE INSTITUTION OF ENGINEERING AND TECHNOLOGY, GB, (20150528), vol. 51, no. 11, doi:10.1049/EL.2015.1574, ISSN 0013-5194, page 799, XP006052173 [Y] 11,21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/el.2015.1574 | [XY] - RICCI PETER P. ET AL, "Free-standing, thin-film sensors for the trace detection of explosives", SCIENTIFIC REPORTS, (20210323), vol. 11, no. 1, doi:10.1038/s41598-021-86077-6, pages 1 - 10, XP055968058 [X] 1-4,9,10,13,17-20,22-31,36-38 * the whole document * [Y] 24 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s41598-021-86077-6 | by applicant | US9759699 | US11333648 |