Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP4364228 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

CN202280051637 EP22747852 JP2023580696 KR20247003143 US2022035467W US202217851955 US202318172660



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US2023207902Global Dossier 29.06.2023A1
Priority number Date
US202163202930 30.06.2021
US202318172660 22.02.2023
US202217851955 28.06.2022
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US11616258Global Dossier 28.03.2023B2
US2023006269 05.01.2023A1
Priority number Date
US202163202930 30.06.2021
US202217851955 28.06.2022
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR20240027075Global Dossier 29.02.2024A
Priority number Date
WO2022US35467 29.06.2022
US202163202930 30.06.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP2024527552Global Dossier 25.07.2024A
Priority number Date
WO2022US35467 29.06.2022
US202163202930 30.06.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN117693845Global Dossier 12.03.2024A
Priority number Date
WO2022US35467 29.06.2022
US202163202930 30.06.2021
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP4364228Global Dossier 08.05.2024A1
Priority number Date
WO2022US35467 29.06.2022
US202163202930 30.06.2021
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2023278536Global Dossier 05.01.2023A1
Priority number Date
US202163202930 30.06.2021
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
TW202316713 16.04.2023A
Priority number Date
US202163202930 30.06.2021