EP4373965 - METHOD AND SYSTEM COMPRISING A CARTRIDGE FOR SEQUENCING TARGET POLYNUCLEOTIDES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.01.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | 27.04.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 27.04.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DNAe Diagnostics Limited Scale Space, 58 Wood Lane London W12 7RZ / GB | [2024/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REED, Sam London W12 7RZ / GB | 02 /
NELSON, Norm London W12 7RZ / GB | 03 /
WOOLDRIDGE, David London W12 7RZ / GB | 04 /
FATOYINBO, Henry London W12 7RZ / GB | 05 /
MARTURANO, Alessandro London W12 7RZ / GB | 06 /
MORLEY, Dan London W12 7RZ / GB | 07 /
WORSLEY, Graham London W12 7RZ / GB | 08 /
STANDRIDGE, Douglas Edward Oceanside, California 92056 / US | 09 /
LIPINSKI, Kamil Andrzej London SW8 1UD / GB | 10 /
BROWN, Bradley San Marcos, California 92069 / US | 11 /
FLAMM, Alex Baltimore, Maryland 21131 / US | 12 /
LANE, Ben Baltimore, Maryland 21131 / US | 13 /
SPRINGER, Melanie Baltimore, Maryland 21131 / US | [2024/22] | Representative(s) | Stratagem IPM Limited Meridian Court Comberton Road Toft, Cambridge CB23 2RY / GB | [2024/22] | Application number, filing date | 22748061.3 | 21.07.2022 | [2024/22] | WO2022GB51909 | Priority number, date | GB20210010479 | 21.07.2021 Original published format: GB 202110479 | GB20210010485 | 21.07.2021 Original published format: GB 202110485 | US202163224116P | 21.07.2021 Original published format: US 202163224116 P | [2024/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023002203 | Date: | 26.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4373965 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/6844, C12Q1/6853, C12Q1/6869, B01L3/00, G01N27/414 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6869 (EP);
G01N27/4145 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM MIT EINER KARTUSCHE ZUR SEQUENZIERUNG VON ZIELPOLYNUKLEOTIDEN | [2024/22] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM COMPRISING A CARTRIDGE FOR SEQUENCING TARGET POLYNUCLEOTIDES | [2024/22] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME COMPRENANT UNE CARTOUCHE POUR LE SÉQUENÇAGE DE POLYNUCLÉOTIDES CIBLES | [2024/22] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/22] | 01.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2012024658 (INTEGENX INC [US], et al); | [Y]AU2014259546 (IBIS BIOSCIENCES INC [US]); | [Y]WO2015189636 (ILLUMINA CAMBRIDGE LTD [GB]) | by applicant | US4683195 | US4683202 | US4786600 | US4800159 | EP0320308 | US4868105 | US5124246 | US5130238 | WO9313121 | US5378825 | US5399491 | US5422252 | US5437990 | WO9532305 | US5554516 | US5585481 | US5854033 | US6143495 | US6323009 | US7270981 | EP1916311 | US7666598 | US7686929 | US2010137143 | US7972820 | US8012690 | US8685228 | US8986525 | US9169513 | US9683255 | US2018087099 | US2018105871 | US2018112251 | US10370652 | WO2021GB50098 |