EP4363112 - UNIVERSAL ASSAY CARTRIDGE AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | 06.09.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cepheid 904 Caribbean Drive E. Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | [2024/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NANDURI, Harika Sunnyvale, California 94089 / US | 02 /
WEITSMAN, Andrew Sunnyvale, California 94089 / US | 03 /
GLASS, Jennifer Sunnyvale, California 94089 / US | 04 /
IBANEZ, Michelle Wei Sunnyvale, California 94089 / US | 05 /
NOYES, Tina Sunnyvale, California 94089 / US | [2024/19] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2024/19] | Application number, filing date | 22748158.7 | 30.06.2022 | [2024/19] | WO2022US35859 | Priority number, date | US202163217672P | 01.07.2021 Original published format: US 202163217672 P | [2024/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023278798 | Date: | 05.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4363112 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B01L3/00 | [2024/19] | CPC: |
B01L3/502715 (EP,KR);
B01L3/502761 (EP,KR,US);
B01L3/502738 (EP,KR);
B01L3/563 (EP,KR);
C12Q1/6844 (US);
B01L2200/04 (KR,US);
B01L2200/0647 (EP,KR,US);
B01L2200/10 (EP);
B01L2200/16 (KR,US);
B01L2300/0654 (US);
B01L2300/0681 (EP,KR,US);
B01L2300/0864 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/19] | Title | German: | UNIVERSELLE TESTKASSETTE UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG | [2024/19] | English: | UNIVERSAL ASSAY CARTRIDGE AND METHODS OF USE | [2024/19] | French: | CARTOUCHE DE DOSAGE UNIVERSELLE ET MÉTHODES D'UTILISATION | [2024/19] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/19] | 15.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2003162304 (DORITY DOUGLAS B [US], et al) [X] 1,11,41-43 * paragraphs [0004] - [0006] - [0 44] , [0 53] , [0 77] , [0 88] - [0092] - [0 95]; figures 1-4, 16-23 * [I] 2,5-9,44,46-52; | [XI]US2020197934 (AMSHEY JOSEPH [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,11,40,45 * paragraphs [0098] , [ 124] , [ 128] , [ 137] , [ 169] - [0174]; figures 16A-B *[I] 10,12-14,50 | by applicant | US6374684 | US6818185 | US8048386 |