EP4373739 - CONTROL SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING MARINE VESSELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.01.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | 27.09.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Caterpillar Inc. 100 NE Adams Street Peoria, IL 61629-9510 / US | [2024/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEATHERY, Brian Philip Hockley, Texas 77064 / US | 02 /
GANDY, Cameron Scott Houston, Texas 77064 / US | [2024/22] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2024/22] | Application number, filing date | 22748614.9 | 06.07.2022 | [2024/22] | WO2022US36201 | Priority number, date | US202117443185 | 22.07.2021 Original published format: US202117443185 | [2024/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023003691 | Date: | 26.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4373739 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B63H21/21, B63H21/22, B63H23/28, B63H25/42, B63H20/00, B63H25/02 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
B63H21/213 (EP);
B63H21/21 (US);
B63B17/00 (US);
B63H25/42 (EP);
F02D29/02 (US);
F02D41/0215 (US);
F02D41/062 (US);
F02N1/00 (US);
B63H2020/003 (EP);
B63H2021/216 (EP,US);
B63H2025/028 (EP);
B63H23/02 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/22] | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG VON WASSERFAHRZEUGEN | [2024/22] | English: | CONTROL SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING MARINE VESSELS | [2024/22] | French: | SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE DE NAVIRES MARITIMES | [2024/22] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/22] | 13.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2010250036 (BAMBA TAKAAKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,5-8 * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0113]; figures 1-5 * [I] 2-4,9,10; | [XI]US2011196553 (GARON PIERRE [CA], et al) [X] 1,5-8 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0095]; figures 1-15 * [I] 2-4,9,10; | [XI]US8162703 (BAMBA TAKAAKI [JP]) [X] 1,5-8 * column 5, line 61 - column 21, line 22; figures 1-10 * [I] 2-4,9,10; | [I]US10562602 (GABLE KENNETH G [US], et al) [I] 1-10* column 3, line 8 - column 10, line 44; figures 1-3 * | by applicant | US9878769 |