Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4280227 | Global Dossier | 22.11.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2022CN70364 | 05.01.2022 | CN202110170970 | 08.02.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022166513 | Global Dossier | 11.08.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN202110170970 | 08.02.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113012828B | Global Dossier | 10.05.2024 | B | CN113012828 | 22.06.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | CN202110170970 | 08.02.2021 |