EP4288523 - GENETICALLY ENGINEERED BACTERIUM FOR HANGOVER AND LIVER DISEASE PREVENTION AND/OR TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2023/50] | GENETICALLY GENGINEERED BACTERIUM FOR HANGOVER AND LIVER DISEASE PREVENTION AND/OR TREATMENT | ||
[2023/52] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commbio Therapeutics Co., Ltd. Room 602/603, Building 1, No. 720 Cailun Road Pudong New Area Shanghai 201203 / CN | [2023/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIANG, Bin Shanghai 201203 / CN | 02 /
YIN, Shengming Shanghai 201203 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Yanning Shanghai 201203 / CN | [2023/50] | Representative(s) | Pestalozzi, Deborah Isler & Pedrazzini AG Giesshübelstrasse 45 Postfach 1772 8027 Zürich / CH | [2023/50] | Application number, filing date | 22749257.6 | 08.02.2022 | [2023/50] | WO2022CN75470 | Priority number, date | WO2021CN76102 | 08.02.2021 Original published format: PCT/CN2021/076102 | [2023/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022166978 | Date: | 11.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4288523 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 11.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/21, C12N15/70, C12N15/53, A23C9/13, A61K35/741, A61K38/44, A61P25/32, A61P1/16, C12R1/19 | [2023/50] | CPC: |
C12Y102/0101 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C12N15/70 (EP,CN,KR);
C12N9/0008 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K35/741 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A23C9/13 (CN);
A23L33/135 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K38/44 (CN,KR);
A61P1/16 (CN,KR);
A61P25/32 (CN,KR);
A23C9/1203 (EP);
A23V2002/00 (CN);
A61K2035/115 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/334, A23V2200/30 (CN)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/50] | Title | German: | GENETISCH MANIPULIERTES BAKTERIUM FÜR KATER UND PRÄVENTION UND/ODER BEHANDLUNG VON LEBERERKRANKUNGEN | [2023/50] | English: | GENETICALLY ENGINEERED BACTERIUM FOR HANGOVER AND LIVER DISEASE PREVENTION AND/OR TREATMENT | [2023/52] | French: | BACTÉRIE GÉNÉTIQUEMENT MODIFIÉE POUR LA PRÉVENTION ET/OU LE TRAITEMENT DE LA GUEULE DE BOIS ET DE LA MALADIE DU FOIE | [2023/50] |
Former [2023/50] | GENETICALLY GENGINEERED BACTERIUM FOR HANGOVER AND LIVER DISEASE PREVENTION AND/OR TREATMENT | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 08.09.2023 | Search fee paid | 08.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/50] | 10.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CN101985625 (UNIV NANJING AGRICULTURAL) [A] 1-54 * see the whole document *; | [A]CN110734890 (SHANDONG HANTAI BIOTECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-54 * see the whole document *; | [A]CN110951660 (UNIV JIANGNAN) [A] 1-54 * see the whole document *; | [X]CN111565733 (ZBIOTICS COMPANY) [X] 1-54 * see claims 1-62,SEQ ID NO:4,description,paragraphs[0081]-[0082] *; | [PX]CN113186140 (COMMBIO THERAPEUTICS CO LTD) [PX] 1-54 * see claims 1-54 *; | [A] - He Chongxin, Xu Zhengjie, Pan Qin, "Effect of high-fat diet or high-fructose diet on endogenous ethanol and hepatic ethanol metabolic enzymes in rats", JOURNAL OF PRACTICAL HEPATOLOGY, (20160701), vol. 19, no. 4, doi:10.3969/j.issn.1672-5069.2016.04.009, ISSN 1672-5069, pages 418 - 422, XP055956744 [A] 1-54 * pages 418-422,see the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3969/j.issn.1672-5069.2016.04.009 | by applicant | US2019076489 | - BATZER et al., Nucleic Acid Res., (19910000), vol. 19, page 5081 | - OHTSUKA et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19850000), vol. 260, pages 2605 - 2608 | - ROSSOLINI et al., Mol. Cell. Probes, (19940000), vol. 8, pages 91 - 98 | - ALTSCHUL S.F et al., J. Mol. Biol., (19900000), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410 | - STEPHEN F. et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (19970000), vol. 25, pages 3389 - 3402 | - HIGGINS D.G et al., Methods in Enzymology, (19960000), vol. 266, pages 383 - 402 | - LARKIN M.A. et al., Bioinformatics (Oxford, England, (20070000), vol. 23, no. 21, pages 2947 - 8 | - CHAUDHRY KK et al., Alcoholism, clinical and experimental research, (20150000), vol. 39, pages 1465 - 75 | - PUROHIT VET, Hepatology (Baltimore, Md)., (20060000), vol. 43, pages 872 - 8 | - GUO et al., Clinical and Experimental Pharmacology and Physiology, (20090000), vol. 36, pages 463 - 8 | - AGARWAL, Pathol Biol (Paris)., (20011100), vol. 49, no. 9, pages 703 - 9 | - RAMCHANDANI et al., Pathol Biol (Paris), (20011100), vol. 49, no. 9, pages 676 - 82 | - VASILIOU et al., Pharmacology, (20000900), vol. 61, no. 3, pages 192 - 8 | - YOSHIDA, Pharmacogenetics, (19920800), vol. 2, no. 4, pages 139 - 47 | - HIGUCHI S et al., The Lancet, (19940000), vol. 343, pages 741 - 2 | - XIAO JET, Journal of hepatology, vol. 71, pages 212 - 21 | - FAN J-G, Journal of Gastroenterology and Hepatology, (20130000), vol. 28, pages 11 - 7 | - REHM JET, The Lancet, (20090000), vol. 373, pages 2223 - 33 | - SZABO G et al., Hepatology (Baltimore, Md)., (20190000), vol. 69, pages 2271 - 83 | - BAKER et al., PLOS One, vol. 5 | - ZHU et al., Hepatology, (20130200), vol. 57, no. 2, pages 601 - 9 | - CANFORA et al., Nat Rev Endocrinol., (20190500), vol. 15, no. 5, pages 261 - 273 | - YUAN et al., Cell Metabolism, (20190000), vol. 30, pages 675 688 - 688 | - LI et al., Toxicological sciences: an official journal of the Society of Toxicology, (20180000), vol. 164, pages 428 - 38 | - DOORN et al., Chemical research in toxicology, (20060000), vol. 19, pages 102 - 10 | - ZHU et al., Hepatology, (20130000), vol. 57, no. 2, pages 601 - 609 | - FRANTZ JC et al., JBacteriol, (19790000), vol. 137, pages 1263 - 1270 | - AMARETTI A et al., Appl Environ Microbiol, (20070000), vol. 73, pages 3637 - 364 | - WEIMER PJ et al., Appl Environ Microbiol, (19770000), vol. 33, pages 289 - 297 |