EP4272958 - LAYERED STRUCTURE FOR AUTOMOTIVE EMBLEM AND OBJECT-SENSING STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.10.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Resonac Corporation 9-1, Higashi-Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-7325 / JP | [2024/13] |
Former [2023/45] | For all designated states Resonac Corporation 13-9, Shiba Daimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8518 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MITSUISHI, Naoko Tagawa-shi, Fukuoka 825-0005 / JP | [2023/45] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2023/45] | Application number, filing date | 22749477.0 | 18.01.2022 | [2023/45] | WO2022JP01656 | Priority number, date | JP20210017450 | 05.02.2021 Original published format: JP 2021017450 | [2023/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022168601 | Date: | 11.08.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4272958 | Date: | 08.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.08.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/08, B32B25/08, B32B25/14, B32B25/16, B32B27/20, B32B27/36, B60R13/00 | [2024/28] | CPC: |
B60R13/005 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B25/08 (EP,US);
B32B25/14 (EP);
B32B25/16 (EP,US);
B32B27/20 (EP);
B32B27/302 (EP);
B32B27/308 (EP);
B32B27/365 (EP,US);
B32B27/38 (EP,US);
B32B27/40 (EP,US);
B32B3/04 (EP);
B32B7/12 (EP);
G01S13/931 (US);
G01S7/028 (US);
B32B2250/03 (EP);
B32B2250/04 (EP);
B32B2250/24 (EP);
B32B2250/40 (EP);
B32B2250/44 (EP);
B32B2255/10 (EP);
B32B2255/205 (EP);
B32B2264/108 (EP);
B32B2307/4026 (EP,US);
B32B2307/412 (EP);
B32B2307/7376 (EP,US);
B32B2451/00 (US);
|
Former IPC [2023/45] | B32B27/00, B32B27/36, B60R13/00, B32B7/025 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/45] | Title | German: | SCHICHTSTRUKTUR FÜR EIN EMBLEM FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG UND OBJEKTERFASSUNGSSTRUKTUR | [2023/45] | English: | LAYERED STRUCTURE FOR AUTOMOTIVE EMBLEM AND OBJECT-SENSING STRUCTURE | [2023/45] | French: | STRUCTURE EN COUCHES POUR EMBLÈME D'AUTOMOBILE ET STRUCTURE DE DÉTECTION D'OBJET | [2023/45] | Entry into regional phase | 04.08.2023 | Translation filed | 04.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 04.08.2023 | Search fee paid | 04.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/45] | 11.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.06.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2016141355 (TOYODA GOSEI KK); | [X]JP2018159585 (FALTEC CO LTD); | [X]JP2019069713 (FALTEC CO LTD); | [XI]US2019232886 (OKUMURA KOJI [JP], et al); | [XI]JP2019166888 (TOYODA GOSEI KK); | [X]JP2020005057 (NISSHA CO LTD); | [X]US2020153093 (GOETZELMANN JOHANNES [DE]) | International search | [A]JP2009120122 (TOYODA GOSEI KK); | [X]JP2016141355 (TOYODA GOSEI KK); | [A]JP2019166888 (TOYODA GOSEI KK) | by applicant | JP2003019765 | JP2021017450 |