EP4377727 - HIGH PERFORMANCE MULTI SPECTRAL COATED FREEFORM OPTICAL ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dolby Laboratories Licensing Corporation 1275 Market Street San Francisco, CA 94103 / US | [2024/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEVINE, Titus San Francisco, California 94103 / US | [2024/23] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [2024/23] | Application number, filing date | 22751226.6 | 27.07.2022 | [2024/23] | WO2022US38519 | Priority number, date | US202163226657P | 28.07.2021 Original published format: US 202163226657 P | EP20210192732 | 24.08.2021 Original published format: EP 21192732 | [2024/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023009621 | Date: | 02.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4377727 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G02B3/04, G02B27/01, G02B5/28 | [2024/23] | CPC: |
G02B27/0172 (EP);
G02B3/04 (EP);
G02B5/285 (EP);
G02B2027/011 (EP);
G02B2027/013 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OPTISCHE HOCHLEISTUNGSELEMENTE MIT MULTISPEKTRALER BESCHICHTUNG UND FREIFORMSTRUKTUR | [2024/23] | English: | HIGH PERFORMANCE MULTI SPECTRAL COATED FREEFORM OPTICAL ELEMENTS | [2024/23] | French: | ÉLÉMENTS OPTIQUES DE FORME LIBRE REVÊTUS MULTISPECTRAUX HAUTE PERFORMANCE | [2024/23] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/23] | 08.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US8827446 (IYER VENKATRAMANI [US], et al); | [IY]KR20200046961 (NEO HANA TECH [KR]); | [IY]US10881287 (OUDERKIRK ANDREW JOHN [US], et al) |