Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
13.09.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] |
13.09.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] |
12.04.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
12.04.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
12.04.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
22.03.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
14.02.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
09.02.2024 | Change - representative | |
09.02.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
09.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
13.01.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
13.01.2023 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
19.08.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication |