EP4160380 - DATA READ-WRITE METHOD, AND HYBRID MEMORY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.03.2023 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | 22.08.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honor Device Co., Ltd. Suite 3401, Unit A, Building 6 Shum Yip Sky Park No. 8089, Hongli West Road Xiangmihu Street, Futian District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518040 / CN | [2023/15] |
Former [2023/14] | For all designated states Honor Device Co., Ltd. Suite 3401, Unit A, Building 6 Shum Yip Sky Park, No. 8089 Hongli West Road Xiangmihu Street, Futian District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518040 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Zhongjie Shenzhen, Guangdong 518040 / CN | [2023/14] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2023/14] | Application number, filing date | 22752085.5 | 17.01.2022 | [2023/14] | WO2022CN72416 | Priority number, date | CN202110182302 | 09.02.2021 Original published format: CN202110182302 | CN202110654001 | 11.06.2021 Original published format: CN202110654001 | [2023/14] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022170923 | Date: | 18.08.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4160380 | Date: | 05.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 18.08.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/06, G06F12/02 | [2024/02] | CPC: |
G06F3/0656 (EP);
G06F3/0619 (CN);
G06F3/0655 (US);
G06F12/0284 (EP);
G06F12/0292 (EP);
G06F12/10 (CN,US);
G06F3/0604 (US);
G06F3/061 (EP);
G06F3/0625 (CN);
G06F3/0644 (CN);
G06F3/0679 (EP);
G06F3/068 (US);
G06F2212/1016 (EP);
G06F2212/1028 (EP);
G06F2212/205 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2023/14] | G06F3/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/14] | Title | German: | DATENSCHREIB-LESEVERFAHREN UND HYBRIDSPEICHER | [2023/14] | English: | DATA READ-WRITE METHOD, AND HYBRID MEMORY | [2023/14] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE LECTURE-ÉCRITURE DE DONNÉES ET MÉMOIRE HYBRIDE | [2023/14] | Entry into regional phase | 30.12.2022 | Translation filed | 30.12.2022 | National basic fee paid | 30.12.2022 | Search fee paid | 30.12.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.12.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.12.2022 | Examination requested [2023/14] | 05.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2017068304 (LEE YEN-LIN [TW], et al); | [A]US2019196989 (LU TIANYUE [CN], et al); | [XI]US2020081763 (MITTAL SAMIR [US], et al); | [A]US2020167297 (NIU DIMIN [US], et al) | International search | [A]CN101561950 (BEIJING WATCH DATA SYS CO LTD [CN]) [A] 1-21 * entire document *; | [A]CN102314321 (NETAC TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-21 * entire document *; | [A]US2017046169 (CHEN CHENG-YU [TW], et al) [A] 1-21 * entire document *; | [X]CN106775476 (UNIV PLA SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY) [X] 1, 5-11, 15-21 * description abstract, description paragraphs [0002]-[0020], [0052]-[0056], [0081]-[0091] *; | [A]US2019317894 (FROLIKOV ALEX [US]) [A] 1-21* entire document * |