Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
11.09.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] |
06.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] |
06.09.2024 | Change - classification | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] |
10.05.2024 | Change - classification | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] |
10.05.2024 | Change - classification | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] |
12.04.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
12.04.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] |
03.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
08.09.2023 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 11.10.2023 [2023/41] |
08.09.2023 | Request for examination filed | published on 11.10.2023 [2023/41] |
17.07.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
12.07.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
10.07.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
10.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant | |
07.07.2023 | Change - representative | |
07.07.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
19.08.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
19.08.2022 | New entry: applicant or inventor |