Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023354471 | Global Dossier | 02.11.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN202110184958 | 10.02.2021 | WO2022CN75538 | 08.02.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20230124733 | Global Dossier | 25.08.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | CN202110184958 | 10.02.2021 | WO2022CN75538 | 08.02.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2024503666 | Global Dossier | 26.01.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | CN202110184958 | 10.02.2021 | WO2022CN75538 | 08.02.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4258780 | Global Dossier | 11.10.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN202110184958 | 10.02.2021 | WO2022CN75538 | 08.02.2022 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2022171085 | Global Dossier | 18.08.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN202110184958 | 10.02.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114915987 | Global Dossier | 16.08.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | CN202110184958 | 10.02.2021 |