EP4292792 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING MOLDED BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | 12.04.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zeon Corporation 6-2, Marunouchi, 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8246 / JP | [2023/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KODEMURA, Junji Tokyo 100-8246 / JP | [2023/51] | Representative(s) | Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/51] | Gerauer, Marc Philippé Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 22752528.4 | 17.01.2022 | [2023/51] | WO2022JP01405 | Priority number, date | JP20210018992 | 09.02.2021 Original published format: JP 2021018992 | [2023/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022172696 | Date: | 18.08.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4292792 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B29C41/14, B29C41/36, B29K9/00, B29L22/00, C08F6/00, C08F8/00, C08J5/02 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
C08J5/02 (EP);
C08L47/00 (US);
B29C41/14 (EP);
B29C41/36 (EP);
C08J5/18 (EP);
B29K2009/00 (EP);
B29K2105/0064 (EP);
B29L2022/00 (EP);
B29L2031/4864 (EP);
C08J2307/02 (EP);
C08J2309/08 (EP);
C08J2309/10 (EP);
C08L2201/52 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/51] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES FORMKÖRPERS | [2023/51] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING MOLDED BODY | [2023/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN CORPS MOULÉ | [2023/51] | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.2023 | Translation filed | 02.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2023 | Search fee paid | 02.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2002241412 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0010]-[0020], [0036], [0048] *; | [A]JP2017538799 (LG CHEM, LTD.) [A] 1-7* entire text, all drawings *; | [Y]WO2019151020 (ZEON CORP [JP]) [Y] 4 * paragraphs [0027], [0063] *; | [YX]WO2020054247 (ZEON CORP [JP]) [Y] 4 [X] 1-3, 5, 7; | [YX]JP2020164690 (NIPPON ZEON CO) [Y] 4 [X] 1-3, 5, 7; | [YX]WO2021006118 (DENKA COMPANY LTD [JP]) [Y] 4 [X] 1, 3, 5, 7 | by applicant | WO2014129547 | WO2018155243 |