EP4292743 - CIRCUIT BOARD AND MANUFACTURING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NHK Spring Co., Ltd. 10, Fukuura 3-chome Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | [2023/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TANAKA, Ryo Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | 02 /
YAMAUCHI, Yuichiro Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | 03 /
SUZUKI, Kohei Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | [2023/51] | Representative(s) | Oppermann, Frank OANDO Oppermann & Oppermann Wilhelminenstrasse 1a 65193 Wiesbaden / DE | [2023/51] | Application number, filing date | 22752596.1 | 27.01.2022 | [2023/51] | WO2022JP03154 | Priority number, date | JP20210020504 | 12.02.2021 Original published format: JP 2021020504 | [2023/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022172767 | Date: | 18.08.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4292743 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.08.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B23K1/00, B23K20/10, H01L23/13, H01L23/12, H01L23/36, H05K1/02, H05K3/00, H05K3/24, // H05K1/18, H01L23/373, B23K101/42, B23K1/20 | [2024/32] | CPC: |
B23K1/20 (EP);
H01L24/83 (US);
B23K1/0016 (EP);
B23K20/10 (EP);
H01L23/498 (US);
H01L24/32 (US);
H01L24/75 (US);
H05K1/0209 (EP);
H05K1/183 (US);
H05K1/186 (US);
H05K3/0061 (EP);
H05K3/24 (EP);
H05K3/3463 (US);
B23K2101/42 (EP);
H01L2224/05014 (US);
H01L2224/26175 (US);
H01L2224/32225 (US);
H01L2224/75353 (US);
H01L2224/83205 (US);
H01L2224/83385 (US);
H01L23/3735 (EP);
H01L23/3737 (EP);
H01L2924/3511 (US);
H05K1/181 (EP);
H05K1/188 (EP);
H05K2201/0373 (EP);
H05K2201/066 (EP);
H05K2201/09745 (EP);
H05K2201/10553 (EP);
H05K2201/10598 (EP);
H05K2201/10969 (EP);
H05K2201/2072 (EP);
H05K2203/0285 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/51] | B23K1/00, B23K20/10, H01L23/13, H01L23/12, H01L23/36 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/51] | Title | German: | LEITERPLATTE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2023/51] | English: | CIRCUIT BOARD AND MANUFACTURING METHOD | [2023/51] | French: | CARTE DE CIRCUIT IMPRIMÉ ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2023/51] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2023 | Translation filed | 08.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2023 | Search fee paid | 08.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2006245171 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [Y]US2019054562 (MIYASHIRO HIROSHI [JP], et al) | International search | [AY]JPH05235117 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [AY]JP2002050730 (DENSHO ENGINEERING KK); | [AY]JP2006245171 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JP2007123937 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JP2010123680 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [AY]WO2018143410 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [AY]JP2018142570 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) |