EP4391959 - CLEANING DEVICE FOR INTERDENTAL CLEANING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.02.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2024 | New entry: Decision on request for further processing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Engineerd MD Germany GmbH Heiligenberger Straße 44 88356 Ostrach / DE | [2024/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRÜN, Volker 35789 Weilmünster / DE | 02 /
LEGNER, Andreas 35796 Weinbach / DE | [2024/27] | Representative(s) | Launhardt, Thomas Parkstraße 11-13 65549 Limburg / DE | [2024/27] | Application number, filing date | 22753602.6 | 01.08.2022 | [2024/27] | WO2022DE100554 | Priority number, date | DE202110120284 | 04.08.2021 Original published format: DE102021120284 | [2024/27] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023011687 | Date: | 09.02.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4391959 | Date: | 03.07.2024 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.02.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61C15/04, A61C17/34 | [2024/27] | CPC: |
A61C15/047 (EP);
A61C15/048 (EP);
A61C17/3418 (EP);
A61C17/3454 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REINIGUNGSVORRICHTUNG ZUR INTERDENTALREINIGUNG | [2024/27] | English: | CLEANING DEVICE FOR INTERDENTAL CLEANING | [2024/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE NETTOYAGE POUR NETTOYAGE INTERDENTAIRE | [2024/27] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2024 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/27] | 27.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2024/27] | 22.05.2024 | Examination requested [2024/27] | 22.05.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 23.05.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 23.05.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.06.2024 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 22.05.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 22.05.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.06.2024 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 22.05.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 22.05.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.06.2024 | Decision despatched |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |