EP4373609 - USE OF TRIVALENT DOPED CERIUM OXIDE COMPOSITIONS FOR BIOLOGICAL CONTAMINANT REMOVAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.01.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neo Chemicals & Oxides, LLC 8101 E. Prentice Avenue, Suite 525 Greenwood Village, CO 80111 / US | [2024/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PSARAS, Dimitrios Greenwood Village, CO 80111 / US | 02 /
HANELINE, Mason, Reames Greenwood Village, CO 80111 / US | 03 /
WILLIAMS, Steven Paul Sillamae, 40231 / EE | [2024/22] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [2024/22] | Application number, filing date | 22753910.3 | 21.07.2022 | [2024/22] | WO2022US37827 | Priority number, date | US202163224317P | 21.07.2021 Original published format: US 202163224317 P | [2024/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023004013 | Date: | 26.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4373609 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B01J20/06, B01J20/32, B01J20/28, C02F1/28, C02F1/50 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
B01J20/06 (EP,US);
C01F17/235 (US);
B01J20/2805 (EP);
B01J20/3204 (EP);
B01J20/321 (EP);
B01J20/3212 (EP);
B01J20/3236 (EP);
C02F1/281 (EP,US);
C02F1/288 (EP);
C02F1/50 (EP);
C02F1/001 (EP);
C02F2303/04 (EP);
C02F2307/02 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON DREIWERTIGEN DOTIERTEN CEROXID-ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR ENTFERNUNG BIOLOGISCHER VERUNREINIGUNGEN | [2024/22] | English: | USE OF TRIVALENT DOPED CERIUM OXIDE COMPOSITIONS FOR BIOLOGICAL CONTAMINANT REMOVAL | [2024/22] | French: | UTILISATION DE COMPOSITIONS D'OXYDE DE CÉRIUM DOPÉ TRIVALENT POUR L'ÉLIMINATION DE CONTAMINANTS BIOLOGIQUES | [2024/22] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/22] | 25.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2009107925 (BURBA III JOHN L [US], et al); | [X]US2009112043 (BURBA III JOHN L [US], et al); | [X]EP2502959 (ASAHI KASEI CHEMICALS CORP [JP]); | [A]WO2015197656 (RHODIA OPERATIONS [FR]) |