Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
28.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | |
12.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
27.04.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
27.04.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
27.04.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] |
03.04.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
06.02.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
30.01.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
26.01.2024 | Change - representative | |
26.01.2024 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
19.01.2024 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
27.01.2023 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
27.01.2023 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
23.08.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication |