Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023035362 | Global Dossier | 02.02.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202163224317 | 21.07.2021 | US202217870068 | 21.07.2022 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2024526932 | Global Dossier | 19.07.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2022US37827 | 21.07.2022 | US202163224317 | 21.07.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3227069 | Global Dossier | 26.01.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2022US37827 | 21.07.2022 | US202163224317 | 21.07.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4373609 | Global Dossier | 29.05.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2022US37827 | 21.07.2022 | US202163224317 | 21.07.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2024000985 | 12.02.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2022US37827 | 21.07.2022 | US202163224317 | 21.07.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2023004013 | Global Dossier | 26.01.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202163224317 | 21.07.2021 |