EP4294441 - ANTI-CLDN18.2 ANTIBODY CONJUGATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | 27.04.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Suzhou Transcenta Therapeutics Co., Ltd. B6-501, 218 Xinghu Street Suzhou, Jiangsu 215123 / CN | For all designated states Beijing Cancer Hospital No. 52 Fucheng Road Haidian District Beijing 100142 / CN | [2023/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QIAN, Xueming Suzhou, Jiangsu 215123 / CN | 02 /
ZHU, Hua Beijing 100142 / CN | 03 /
TENG, Fei Suzhou, Jiangsu 215123 / CN | 04 /
LI, Hongjun Suzhou, Jiangsu 215123 / CN | 05 /
YANG, Zhi Beijing 100142 / CN | 06 /
GU, Yi Suzhou, Jiangsu 215123 / CN | 07 /
DING, Jin Beijing 100142 / CN | 08 /
WANG, Feng Beijing 100142 / CN | [2023/52] | Representative(s) | Straus, Alexander 2K Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bajuwarenring 14 82041 Oberhaching / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/52] | Straus, Alexander 2K Patent- und Rechtsanwälte - München Keltenring 9 82041 Oberhaching / DE | Application number, filing date | 22755582.8 | 18.02.2022 | [2023/52] | WO2022CN76810 | Priority number, date | WO2021CN76910 | 19.02.2021 Original published format: PCT/CN2021/076910 | WO2022CN74750 | 28.01.2022 Original published format: PCT/CN2022/074750 | [2023/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022174809 | Date: | 25.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4294441 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.08.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 25.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, C07K16/30, A61K47/50, C12Q1/6886, A61P35/00 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP,KR);
A61K51/1096 (EP,KR,US);
A61K51/1045 (EP,KR,US);
C07K16/28 (EP,KR,US);
C07K16/30 (EP,KR);
A61K2123/00 (US);
C07K2317/24 (EP,KR,US);
C07K2317/30 (EP,KR);
C07K2317/33 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/52] | Title | German: | ANTI-CLDN18.2-ANTIKÖRPERKONJUGATE | [2023/52] | English: | ANTI-CLDN18.2 ANTIBODY CONJUGATES | [2023/52] | French: | CONJUGUÉS D'ANTICORPS ANTI-CLDN18.2 | [2023/52] | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.2023 | Search fee paid | 06.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/52] | 08.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2009169547 (SAHIN UGUR [DE], et al); | [A]US10421817 (HU WENQI [US], et al); | [A]WO2020025792 (AMGEN RES MUNICH GMBH [DE], et al); | [X]CN111777681 (SHANGHAI LIANGYUE BIOMEDICAL TECH CO LTD); | [A]WO2020238730 (SANYOU BIOPHARMACEUTICALS CO LTD [CN]); | [A]US2021009686 (SONG YUNTAO [US], et al) |