EP4257632 - PHOTOSENSITIVE COMPOSITION COMPRISING ORGANIC METAL COMPOUND AND POLYSILOXANE COPOLYMER, AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | 19.04.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hunet Plus Co., Ltd. 15, 2gongdan 3-ro Seobuk-gu Cheonan-si, Chungcheongnam-do 31075 / KR | [2023/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHA, Hyuk Jin Seoul 06191 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Eung Chan Gunpo-si Gyeonggi-do 15821 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Keun Soo Daejeon 35244 / KR | [2023/41] | Representative(s) | Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte · Rechtsanwälte Sohnckestraße 12 81479 München / DE | [2023/41] | Application number, filing date | 22756530.6 | 17.02.2022 | [2023/41] | WO2022KR02381 | Priority number, date | KR20210021710 | 18.02.2021 Original published format: KR 20210021710 | [2023/41] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022177332 | Date: | 25.08.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4257632 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C08G77/04, C08G77/30, C08L83/06, C09D183/06, G03F7/075 | [2023/41] | CPC: |
G03F7/0042 (EP);
G03F7/004 (KR);
C08G77/30 (KR,US);
C08G79/04 (KR,US);
C09D183/14 (EP);
G03F7/0757 (EP,KR,US);
C08G77/58 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/41] | Title | German: | LICHTEMPFINDLICHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT ORGANISCHER METALLVERBINDUNG UND POLYSILOXANCOPOLYMER SOWIE HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2023/41] | English: | PHOTOSENSITIVE COMPOSITION COMPRISING ORGANIC METAL COMPOUND AND POLYSILOXANE COPOLYMER, AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR | [2023/41] | French: | COMPOSITION PHOTOSENSIBLE COMPRENANT UN COMPOSÉ MÉTALLIQUE ORGANIQUE ET UN COPOLYMÈRE DE POLYSILOXANE, ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION | [2023/41] | Entry into regional phase | 05.07.2023 | Translation filed | 05.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 05.07.2023 | Search fee paid | 05.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2004031200 (RHODIA CHIMIE SA [FR], et al) [A] 1-8 * See page 15; and claims 1-13. *; | [A]KR20180014961 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-8 * See claims 1-12; and paragraphs [0204]-[0240]. *; | [A]CN109705354 (ZHEJIANG WYNCA CHEMICAL INDUSTRY GROUP CO LTD) [A] 1-8* See claims 1-10. *; | [A]WO2019129802 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-8 * See claims 1-17. *; | [A]KR20190122656 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [A] 1-8 * See claims 1-14. * | by applicant | KR0143859B | KR100655945B |