EP4295087 - HEATING SYSTEM COMPRISING A RESISTIVE HEAT ELEMENT, CONTROLLER FOR SUCH HEATING SYSTEM, AND METHOD OF CONTROLLING A LOAD CURRENT THROUGH SUCH RESISTIVE HEAT ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | 27.04.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eqon AS Løkkeveien 99 4008 Stavanger / NO | [2023/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TARAYRE, Christophe 4158 BRU / NO | 02 /
SPANDE, Trond 4026 STAVANGER / NO | [2023/52] | Representative(s) | Håmsø Patentbyrå AS P.O. Box 9 4068 Stavanger / NO | [2023/52] | Application number, filing date | 22756619.7 | 08.02.2022 | [2023/52] | WO2022NO50035 | Priority number, date | NO20210000225 | 22.02.2021 Original published format: NO 20210225 | [2023/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022177442 | Date: | 25.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4295087 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.08.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | XN | 25.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F24D13/02, H05B3/56, G05B15/02 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
F24D13/02 (EP);
F24D13/024 (NO,US);
H05B1/0275 (EP,US);
F24D19/1096 (US);
G05B15/02 (EP,NO);
H02M3/158 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/52] | Title | German: | HEIZSYSTEM MIT EINEM WIDERSTANDSHEIZELEMENT, REGLER FÜR EIN SOLCHES HEIZSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR REGELUNG EINES LASTSTROMS DURCH EIN SOLCHES WIDERSTANDSHEIZELEMENT | [2023/52] | English: | HEATING SYSTEM COMPRISING A RESISTIVE HEAT ELEMENT, CONTROLLER FOR SUCH HEATING SYSTEM, AND METHOD OF CONTROLLING A LOAD CURRENT THROUGH SUCH RESISTIVE HEAT ELEMENT | [2023/52] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CHAUFFAGE COMPRENANT UN ÉLÉMENT CHAUFFANT RÉSISTIF, CONTRÔLEUR POUR UN TEL SYSTÈME DE CHAUFFAGE ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UN COURANT DE CHARGE À TRAVERS UN TEL ÉLÉMENT CHAUFFANT RÉSISTIF | [2023/52] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2023 | Search fee paid | 10.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.2022 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: XN | 10.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]US2006050464 (VON ARX THEODORE T [US], et al); | [A]US2017191228 (DONG WESLEY [US]); | [A]US2018366945 (BRAGINSKY DAVID [IL], et al); | [A]US2020044883 (TELEFUS MARK [US], et al); | [Y]US2020365346 (TELEFUS MARK [US], et al) |