EP4294990 - HEEL SHROUD FOR MATERIAL MOVING IMPLEMENT AND ASSOCIATED METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | 19.04.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Black Cat Wear Parts Ltd. 5604 59th Street Edmonton AB T6B 3C3 / CA | [2023/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUVANG, John A. Edmonton, AB T6B 3C3 / CA | [2023/52] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [2023/52] | Application number, filing date | 22756667.6 | 10.01.2022 | [2023/52] | WO2022US11754 | Priority number, date | US202117177964 | 17.02.2021 Original published format: US202117177964 | [2023/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022177659 | Date: | 25.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4294990 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.08.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | E02F9/28 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
E02F9/2883 (EP,US);
E02F9/2833 (US);
E02F9/2858 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/52] | Title | German: | FERSENKAPPE FÜR MATERIALBEWEGUNGSGERÄT UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VERFAHREN | [2023/52] | English: | HEEL SHROUD FOR MATERIAL MOVING IMPLEMENT AND ASSOCIATED METHODS | [2023/52] | French: | ENVELOPPE DE TALON POUR OUTIL DE DÉPLACEMENT DE MATÉRIAU ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | [2023/52] | Entry into regional phase | 25.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 25.07.2023 | Search fee paid | 25.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/52] | 13.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4716666 (POTTER JAMES T [US]); | [Y]US2008092413 (MCCLANAHAN ROBERT [US], et al); | [A]WO2011156834 (SANDVIK INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY [SE], et al); | [A]WO2012159155 (SANDVIK SHARK PTY LTD [AU], et al); | [YA]US2016130791 (SERRURIER DOUGLAS [US], et al) |