EP4295430 - LONG-CYCLE-LIFE, HIGH-CAPACITY SILICON ANODES AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | 27.04.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of The University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 5th Floor Oakland, CA 92093-0910 / US | [2023/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Haodong San Diego, California 92130 / US | 02 /
LIU, Ping San Diego, California 92130 / US | [2023/52] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [2023/52] | Application number, filing date | 22756997.7 | 18.02.2022 | [2023/52] | WO2022US16965 | Priority number, date | US202163151547P | 19.02.2021 Original published format: US 202163151547 P | [2023/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022178246 | Date: | 25.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4295430 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.08.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/052, H01M4/02, H01M4/131, H01M4/134, H01M4/587 | [2023/52] | CPC: |
H01M4/0423 (EP,KR);
H01M4/366 (EP,KR,US);
C01B33/02 (US);
H01M10/0525 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/0428 (EP,KR);
H01M4/13 (EP,KR);
H01M4/364 (US);
H01M4/386 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/483 (EP,KR);
H01M4/485 (US);
H01M4/587 (US);
H01M4/625 (EP,KR);
C01P2002/02 (US);
C01P2002/72 (US);
C01P2004/03 (US);
C01P2004/61 (US);
C01P2004/62 (US);
C01P2004/64 (US);
C01P2004/80 (US);
C01P2006/40 (US);
H01M2004/021 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/52] | Title | German: | SILICIUMANODEN MIT LANGER LEBENSDAUER UND HOHER KAPAZITÄT SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | [2023/52] | English: | LONG-CYCLE-LIFE, HIGH-CAPACITY SILICON ANODES AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING THE SAME | [2023/52] | French: | ANODES DE SILICIUM À HAUTE CAPACITÉ ET À LONGUE DURÉE DE VIE, ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION ET D'UTILISATION | [2023/52] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2023 | Search fee paid | 18.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/52] | 09.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2015056507 (DADHEECH GAYATRI VYAS [US], et al) [Y] 3, (4-6)/(3), 28, 29/(28) * entire document; especially Fig. 1; para [0014], para [0018] *; | [Y]US2016315311 (JEON SEONGHO [KR], et al) [Y] 1-6, 26-29, 51-54, 68, 69 * entire document; especially Fig. 3; para [0003], para [0028]-[0045]; para [0106]-[0118] *; | [Y]US2020411828 (YAMAMOTO AKITO [JP], et al) [Y] 51-54, 68, 69* entire document; especially para [0026], para [0037] *; | [Y] - Maletti Sebastian, Podetti Florencia S., Oswald Steffen, Giebeler Lars, Barbero César A., Mikhailova Daria, Balach Juan, "LiV 3 O 8 -Based Functional Separator Coating as Effective Polysulfide Mediator for Lithium-Sulfur Batteries", ACS Applied Energy Materials, (20200323), vol. 3, no. 3, doi:10.1021/acsaem.9b02502, ISSN 2574-0962, pages 2893 - 2899, XP055964417 [Y] 1-6, 26-29, 51-54, 68, 69 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acsaem.9b02502 |