EP4373792 - HIGH ACOUSTIC AND LOW DENSITY BASEMAT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.01.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 29.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states USG Interiors, LLC 550 West Adams Street Chicago, IL 60661-3676 / US | [2024/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XU, Yufeng Gurnee, Illinois 60031 / US | 02 /
CAO, Bangji Naperville, Illinois 60565 / US | 03 /
FRANK, William Lake Villa, Illinois 60046 / US | 04 /
YU, Qing Libertyville, Illinois 60048 / US | 05 /
STOCCO, Louis P. Western Springs, Illinois 60558 / US | 06 /
KELLER, Adam Warren Grayslake, Illinois 60030 / US | [2024/22] | Representative(s) | BSB Patentanwälte Schütte & Engelen Partnerschaft mbB Am Markt 10 59302 Oelde / DE | [2024/22] | Application number, filing date | 22757451.4 | 18.07.2022 | [2024/22] | WO2022US73846 | Priority number, date | US202117443319 | 23.07.2021 Original published format: US202117443319 | [2024/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023004288 | Date: | 26.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4373792 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C03C25/30, B32B17/04, B32B27/20, D04H1/64, C03C25/321, C03C25/42, C03C25/1095, C03C25/26 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
C03C25/321 (EP);
C04B14/46 (US);
B32B17/02 (EP);
B32B19/06 (US);
B32B5/022 (EP,US);
B32B5/265 (EP);
C03C25/1095 (EP);
C03C25/26 (EP);
C03C25/42 (EP);
C04B14/18 (US);
C04B18/241 (US);
C04B28/14 (US);
D04H1/4209 (EP);
D04H1/64 (EP);
B32B2255/02 (EP,US);
B32B2260/021 (EP);
B32B2260/048 (EP);
B32B2262/062 (EP);
B32B2307/102 (EP);
B32B2451/00 (EP);
C04B2111/00629 (US);
D04H1/425 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BASISMATTE MIT HOHER AKUSTIK UND GERINGER DICHTE | [2024/22] | English: | HIGH ACOUSTIC AND LOW DENSITY BASEMAT | [2024/22] | French: | MAT DE BASE À HAUTE PERFORMANCE ACOUSTIQUE ET À BASSE DENSITÉ | [2024/22] | Entry into regional phase | 30.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 30.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/22] | 30.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9908977 (USG INTERIORS INC [US]); | [XI]US2013234058 (ALBARRAN ENRIQUE L [US]) | by applicant | US2005181693 |