EP4393100 - PAGING MONITORING IN TERMINAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | 31.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 31.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2024/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOSKELA, Timo 90670 Oulu / FI | 02 /
KAIKKONEN, Jorma Johannes 90800 Oulu / FI | 03 /
ENESCU, Mihai 02200 Espoo / FI | [2024/27] | Representative(s) | Bryers Intellectual Property Ltd Bristol & Bath Science Park Dirac Crescent, Emerson's Green Bristol, BS16 7FR / GB | [2024/27] | Application number, filing date | 22758188.1 | 28.07.2022 | [2024/27] | WO2022EP71154 | Priority number, date | FI20210006073 | 18.10.2021 Original published format: FI 20216073 | [2024/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023066538 | Date: | 27.04.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4393100 | Date: | 03.07.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.04.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04W52/00, H04W72/00 | [2024/27] | CPC: |
H04L5/0053 (EP);
H04L5/001 (EP);
H04L5/0078 (EP);
H04L5/0094 (EP);
H04W52/0216 (EP);
H04W52/0219 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FUNKRUFÜBERWACHUNG IN EINER ENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG | [2024/27] | English: | PAGING MONITORING IN TERMINAL DEVICE | [2024/27] | French: | SURVEILLANCE DE RADIOMESSAGERIE DANS UN DISPOSITIF TERMINAL | [2024/27] | Entry into regional phase | 26.03.2024 | National basic fee paid | 26.03.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.03.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/27] | 26.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |