EP4396051 - ELECTROPNEUMATIC BRAKE SYSTEM, VEHICLE, METHOD FOR OPERATING AN ELECTROPNEUMATIC BRAKE SYSTEM WITH AN EMERGENCY-RELEASE VALVE UNIT, USE OF AN EMERGENCY-RELEASE VALVE UNIT IN AN ELECTROPNEUMATIC BRAKE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZF CV Systems Global GmbH Giacomettistrasse 1 3006 Bern / CH | [2024/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN THIEL, Julian 30938 Grossburgwedel / DE | [2024/28] | Representative(s) | Rabe, Dirk-Heinrich ZF CV Systems Hannover GmbH Am Lindener Hafen 21 30453 Hannover / DE | [2024/28] | Application number, filing date | 22758229.3 | 01.08.2022 | [2024/28] | WO2022EP71542 | Priority number, date | DE202110122499 | 31.08.2021 Original published format: DE102021122499 | [2024/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023030798 | Date: | 09.03.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4396051 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B60T13/38, B60T17/22 | [2024/28] | CPC: |
B60T13/385 (EP,US);
B60T13/683 (US);
B60T17/083 (US);
B60T17/18 (US);
B60T17/221 (EP);
B60T8/1708 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROPNEUMATISCHES BREMSSYSTEM, FAHRZEUG, VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINES ELEKTROPNEUMATISCHEN BREMSSYSTEMS MIT EINER NOTLÖSE-VENTILEINHEIT, VERWENDUNG EINER NOTLÖSE-VENTILEINHEIT IN EINEM ELEKTROPNEUMATISCHEN BREMSSYSTEM | [2024/28] | English: | ELECTROPNEUMATIC BRAKE SYSTEM, VEHICLE, METHOD FOR OPERATING AN ELECTROPNEUMATIC BRAKE SYSTEM WITH AN EMERGENCY-RELEASE VALVE UNIT, USE OF AN EMERGENCY-RELEASE VALVE UNIT IN AN ELECTROPNEUMATIC BRAKE SYSTEM | [2024/28] | French: | SYSTÈME DE FREINAGE ÉLECTROPNEUMATIQUE, VÉHICULE, PROCÉDÉ DEFONCTIONNEMENT D'UN SYSTÈME DE FREINAGE ÉLECTROPNEUMATIQUE COMPRENANT UNE UNITÉ DE SOUPAPE DE LIBÉRATION D'URGENCE, UTILISATION D'UNE UNITÉ DE SOUPAPE DE LIBÉRATION D'URGENCE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE FREINAGE ÉLECTROPNEUMATIQUE | [2024/28] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/28] | 12.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE102019131110 (WABCO EUROPE BVBA [BE]) | by applicant | DE102019131930 |