Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2024528012 | Global Dossier | 26.07.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2022EP71424 | 29.07.2022 | CN202110872990 | 30.07.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4377149 | Global Dossier | 05.06.2024 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2022EP71424 | 29.07.2022 | CN202110872990 | 30.07.2021 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE112022003799T | 20.06.2024 | T5 | Priority number | Date | WO2022EP71424 | 29.07.2022 | CN202110872990 | 30.07.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2023006983 | Global Dossier | 02.02.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN202110872990 | 30.07.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN115675206 | Global Dossier | 03.02.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | CN202110872990 | 30.07.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI827171B | 21.12.2023 | B | TW202304744 | 01.02.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | CN202110872990 | 30.07.2021 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW202413145 | 01.04.2024 | A | Priority number | Date | CN202110872990 | 30.07.2021 |