EP4287588 - LOAD SHARING METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND CHIP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIONG, Liudong Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Xiangang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
HE, Chunzhi Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2023/49] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Engineering Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | [2023/49] | Application number, filing date | 22758815.9 | 18.02.2022 | [2023/49] | WO2022CN76919 | Priority number, date | CN202110209432 | 24.02.2021 Original published format: CN202110209432 | [2023/49] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022179451 | Date: | 01.09.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4287588 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 01.09.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04L67/1004, H04L49/351 | [2024/14] | CPC: |
H04L47/125 (EP,CN,US);
H04L47/24 (EP);
H04L47/2441 (EP,CN)
|
Former IPC [2023/49] | H04L67/1004 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/49] | Title | German: | LASTTEILUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG SOWIE CHIP | [2023/49] | English: | LOAD SHARING METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND CHIP | [2023/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE PARTAGE DE CHARGE, ET PUCE | [2023/49] | Entry into regional phase | 29.08.2023 | Translation filed | 29.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 29.08.2023 | Search fee paid | 29.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/49] | 18.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2019190838 (SHPINER ALEX [IL], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0038] , [0039] , [0050] - [0063]; figure 4 * * claims 1,6 *; | [A]CN111277467 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-15* the whole document * | International search | [A]CN1758632 (HANGZHOU HUAWEI SANKANG TECH [CN]) [A] 1-23 * entire document *; | [X]CN102404229 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [X] 1-23 * description, paragraphs [0002]-[0080] and figures 1-4 *; | [X]CN107864101 (HANGZHOU DPTECH TECHNOLOGIES CO LTD) [X] 1-23 * description, paragraphs [0002]-[0063] and figures 1-4 *; | [A]US10505849 (INY OFER [IL], et al) [A] 1-23* entire document *; | [X]CN111147598 (HANGZHOU DPTECH TECHNOLOGIES CO LTD) [X] 1-23 * description, paragraphs [0002]-[0113] and figures 1-4 *; | [A]CN111490944 (NEW H3C INFORMATION SECURITY TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-23 * entire document * |