EP4299539 - GLASS COMPOSITION FOR GLASS FIBER, GLASS FIBER, GLASS FIBER FABRIC, AND GLASS FIBER-REINFORCED RESIN COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | 27.04.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nitto Boseki Co., Ltd. 1, Aza Higashi Gonome Fukushima-shi Fukushima 960-8161 / JP | [2024/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOSOKAWA, Takanobu Fukushima-shi, Fukushima 960-8161 / JP | 02 /
KURITA, Tadashi Fukushima-shi, Fukushima 960-8161 / JP | 03 /
NONAKA, Takashi Fukushima-shi, Fukushima 960-8161 / JP | [2024/01] | Representative(s) | Schön, Christoph Dr. Schön, Neymeyr & Partner mbB Bavariaring 26 80336 München / DE | [2024/01] | Application number, filing date | 22759373.8 | 09.02.2022 | [2024/01] | WO2022JP05085 | Priority number, date | JP20210026997 | 24.02.2021 Original published format: JP 2021026997 | [2024/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022181334 | Date: | 01.09.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4299539 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C03C13/02 | [2024/01] | CPC: |
C03C3/118 (EP);
C03C13/00 (EP,KR,US);
C03C3/091 (US);
C03C25/255 (EP);
C03C25/26 (EP);
C03C25/40 (EP);
C03C3/093 (KR);
C03C3/097 (KR);
C08J5/043 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/01] | Title | German: | GLASZUSAMMENSETZUNG FÜR GLASFASER, GLASFASER, GLASFASERGEWEBE UND GLASFASERVERSTÄRKTE HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2024/01] | English: | GLASS COMPOSITION FOR GLASS FIBER, GLASS FIBER, GLASS FIBER FABRIC, AND GLASS FIBER-REINFORCED RESIN COMPOSITION | [2024/01] | French: | COMPOSITION DE VERRE POUR FIBRES DE VERRE, FIBRES DE VERRE, TISSU DE FIBRES DE VERRE, ET COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE RENFORCÉE PAR DES FIBRES DE VERRE | [2024/01] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2023 | Translation filed | 29.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 29.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2023 | Examination requested [2024/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH11292567 (NITTO BOSEKI CO LTD) [A] 1-8 * entire text, all drawings *; | [A]JP2004107112 (NIPPON ELECTRIC GLASS CO) [A] 1-8 * entire text, all drawings *; | [A]JP2006326537 (NIPPON MUKI KK) [A] 1-8 * entire text, all drawings *; | [A]JP2010508226 (AGY HOLDINGS CORP.) [A] 1-8* entire text, all drawings *; | [A]JP2013542904 (PPG INDUSTRIES OHIO, INC.) [A] 1-8 * entire text, all drawings *; | [A]JP6468409B (NITTO BOSEKI CO., LTD.) [A] 1-8 * entire text, all drawings *; | [A]WO2020121761 (NIPPON ELECTRIC GLASS CO [JP]) [A] 1-8 * entire text, all drawings * | by applicant | JP6468409B |