EP4258643 - CAMERA MODULE AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.09.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Seungyong Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/41] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2023/41] | Application number, filing date | 22759936.2 | 09.02.2022 | [2023/41] | WO2022KR01969 | Priority number, date | KR20210026608 | 26.02.2021 Original published format: KR 20210026608 | [2023/41] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022182018 | Date: | 01.09.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4258643 | Date: | 11.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 01.09.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04N23/55, G02B7/02, G02B27/00, H04N23/57, G03B17/12, G02B27/64, G03B30/00, H04N23/00 | [2024/29] | CPC: |
G02B27/0018 (EP);
H04N23/55 (EP,KR,US);
G02B7/021 (EP,KR,US);
G02B27/646 (EP);
G02B7/02 (EP);
G03B17/12 (EP,US);
G03B30/00 (EP);
H04N23/00 (EP);
H04N23/54 (KR,US);
H04N23/57 (EP,KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/41] | H04N5/225, G02B7/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/41] | Title | German: | KAMERAMODUL UND ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG DAMIT | [2023/41] | English: | CAMERA MODULE AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE COMPRISING SAME | [2023/41] | French: | MODULE DE CAMÉRA ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE LE COMPRENANT | [2023/41] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2023 | Translation filed | 04.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2023 | Search fee paid | 04.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]KR101436529B (DIGITAL OPTICS CO LTD [KR]); | [Y]US9418193 (DOWSKI JR EDWARD R [US], et al); | [Y]US9465187 (CALVET ROBERT J [US]); | [A]US10659666 (LIN TSUNG-YU [TW], et al); | [XY]US2020310226 (FENG YA-LAN [TW], et al) | International search | [XY]KR101414826B (DIGITAL OPTICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20170000252 (SAMSUNG ELECTRO MECH [KR]); | [A]KR20190070230 (SAMSUNG ELECTRO MECH [KR]); | [Y]KR20190111482 (LG INNOTEK CO LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20200076175 (SEKONIX CO LTD [KR]) |