EP4298574 - APPARATUS, SYSTEM, AND METHOD OF PROVIDING AUTO-REPLENISHMENT FOR A CONSUMABLES CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nypro Inc. 101 Union Street Clinton, MA 01510 / US | [2024/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BELMONTES, Antonio St. Petersburg, Florida 33716 / US | 02 /
WILLIAMS, Amanda St. Petersburg, Florida 33716 / US | [2024/01] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2024/01] | Application number, filing date | 22760559.9 | 28.02.2022 | [2024/01] | WO2022US18089 | Priority number, date | US202163154171P | 26.02.2021 Original published format: US 202163154171 P | [2024/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022183095 | Date: | 01.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4298574 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 01.09.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/08, G06Q10/06, H04W4/80, G01D21/00, G01F23/24, G01F23/263, G06Q10/087 | [2024/31] | CPC: |
G06Q10/087 (EP,US);
G01D21/00 (EP);
G01F23/24 (EP);
G01F23/263 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2024/01] | G06Q10/08, G06Q10/06, H04W4/80, G01D21/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/01] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG, SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON AUTOMATISCHER NACHFÜLLUNG FÜR EINEN VERBRAUCHSMATERIALBEHÄLTER | [2024/01] | English: | APPARATUS, SYSTEM, AND METHOD OF PROVIDING AUTO-REPLENISHMENT FOR A CONSUMABLES CONTAINER | [2024/01] | French: | APPAREIL, SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE FOURNITURE D'AUTORÉAPPROVISIONNEMENT POUR UN RÉCIPIENT DE PRODUITS CONSOMMABLES | [2024/01] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2023 | Search fee paid | 26.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2017245101 (CHANDRASEKARAN SASHIKANTH [US], et al); | [X]US2017278059 (AJI ADHITHI VENKATESH [US]); | [Y]US2018321072 (WILLIAMS AMANDA [US], et al); | International search | [A]US2018177325 (LYONS MARK [US], et al); | [XY]US2018321072 (WILLIAMS AMANDA [US], et al); | [A]WO2019189974 (MIR [KR]); | [A]US2020003602 (GURUMOHAN PRABHANJAN C [US], et al); | [Y]US2020209051 (TRIVEDI NIRALI [US]) |