EP4363494 - BIODEGRADABLE COMPOSITIONS AND ARTICLES FORMED THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | 30.08.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Chemical Company 200 South Wilcox Drive Kingsport, TN 37660 / US | [2024/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ATKINSON, Paul, Michael Kingsport, TN 37664 / US | 02 /
DONELSON, Michael, Eugene Kingsport, TN 37664 / US | [2024/19] | Representative(s) | Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstraße 5-7 80331 München / DE | [2024/19] | Application number, filing date | 22762161.2 | 28.06.2022 | [2024/19] | WO2022US35224 | Priority number, date | US202163202854P | 28.06.2021 Original published format: US 202163202854 P | [2024/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023278379 | Date: | 05.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4363494 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C08J9/14, C08J9/18, C08J9/232, C08L1/14, C08L67/02, C08L67/04, C09D101/14, C09D167/02, C09D167/04 | [2024/19] | CPC: |
C08B3/16 (EP);
C08J9/0061 (EP,US);
B65D3/22 (US);
C08J5/18 (US);
C08J9/141 (EP);
C08J9/20 (US);
C08L1/14 (EP,US);
C08L67/02 (EP,US);
C08L67/04 (EP);
C09D101/14 (EP,US);
C09D167/02 (EP,US);
C09D167/04 (EP);
D21H19/28 (US);
D21H19/34 (US);
C08J2203/12 (US);
C08J2203/14 (EP,US);
C08J2301/14 (EP,US);
C08J2367/02 (US);
C08J2401/14 (US);
C08J2467/02 (EP,US);
C08J2467/04 (EP,US);
C08J2467/06 (US);
C08L2201/06 (US);
C08L2203/12 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08L67/02, C08L1/14 (EP);
C08L67/04, C08L1/14 (EP);
C09D167/02, C08L1/14 (EP);
C09D167/04, C08L1/14 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/19] | Title | German: | BIOLOGISCH ABBAUBARE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND DARAUS HERGESTELLTE ARTIKEL | [2024/19] | English: | BIODEGRADABLE COMPOSITIONS AND ARTICLES FORMED THEREFROM | [2024/19] | French: | COMPOSITIONS BIODÉGRADABLES ET ARTICLES FORMÉS À PARTIR DE CELLES-CI | [2024/19] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2023 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2023 | Examination requested [2024/19] | 08.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2013040125 (EBERSTALLER ROMAN [AT], et al); | [A]US2020399446 (AN HAINING [US], et al); | [A]WO2021079025 (WOODLY OY [FI]) | by applicant | US3340123 | US5929229 | US6201034 | US8604156 | US9150006 | US20100654404 |