EP4280180 - VIDEO RECORDING DEVICE AND VIDEO RECORDING DEVICE CONTROL PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JVCKenwood Corporation 3-12, Moriyacho Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 2210022 / JP | [2023/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOKOYAMA Fumihiko Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0022 / JP | 02 /
MATSUOKA Tomohiro Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0022 / JP | 03 /
KUCHINOMACHI Takeshi Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0022 / JP | 04 /
SUGITA Yasuo Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0022 / JP | 05 /
HIMUKASHI Takashi Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0022 / JP | 06 /
KARASAWA Manabu Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0022 / JP | 07 /
KOJI Yoshiharu Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 221-0022 / JP | [2023/47] | Representative(s) | Schmidbauer, Andreas Konrad Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [2023/47] | Application number, filing date | 22762768.4 | 07.01.2022 | [2023/47] | WO2022JP00367 | Priority number, date | JP20210034462 | 04.03.2021 Original published format: JP 2021034462 | [2023/47] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022185709 | Date: | 09.09.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4280180 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.09.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G07C5/08, H04N5/77, H04N23/60, G06V40/00 | [2024/33] | CPC: |
G07C5/0866 (EP);
H04N5/77 (EP,US);
H04N23/60 (EP);
H04N23/62 (US);
G06V20/54 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/47] | G07C5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/47] | Title | German: | VIDEOAUFZEICHNUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VIDEOAUFZEICHNUNGSVORRICHTUNGSTEUERUNGSPROGRAMM | [2023/47] | English: | VIDEO RECORDING DEVICE AND VIDEO RECORDING DEVICE CONTROL PROGRAM | [2023/47] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ENREGISTREMENT VIDÉO ET PROGRAMME DE COMMANDE DE DISPOSITIF D'ENREGISTREMENT VIDÉO | [2023/47] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2023 | Translation filed | 14.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2023 | Search fee paid | 14.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.2022 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 14.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2021005279 (JVC KENWOOD CORP) | International search | [Y]JP2009216641 (TOSHIBA CORP, et al); | [Y]JP2016213636 (CANON KK); | [Y]JP2018016116 (UEHARA SHIGEAKI); | [Y]JP2019121259 (AZBIL CORP); | [YX]JP2020042475 (JVC KENWOOD CORP); | [Y]JP2021005280 (JVC KENWOOD CORP) | by applicant | JP2009265787 |