EP4303183 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING SULFIDE SOLID ELECTROLYTE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsui Mining & Smelting Co., Ltd. 1-11-1, Osaki Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141-8584 / JP | [2024/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIKI, Joji Ageo-shi, Saitama 362-0021 / JP | 02 /
MATSUSHITA, Takayuki Ageo-shi, Saitama 362-0021 / JP | 03 /
KANAMORI, Tomohiro Ageo-shi, Saitama 362-0021 / JP | [2024/02] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [2024/02] | Application number, filing date | 22763212.2 | 28.02.2022 | [2024/02] | WO2022JP08389 | Priority number, date | JP20210035758 | 05.03.2021 Original published format: JP 2021035758 | [2024/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022186156 | Date: | 09.09.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4303183 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.09.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.09.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/139, H01M4/62, H01B1/06, H01B1/10, H01M10/0525, H01M10/0562, C01B25/14 | [2024/40] | CPC: |
H01B1/10 (EP,KR);
H01M10/0562 (EP,KR);
H01M10/058 (US);
C01B25/45 (KR);
C01B25/455 (EP);
H01M10/0525 (US);
H01M6/18 (KR);
C01P2002/90 (EP);
H01M2300/0068 (EP,KR,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP,KR)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2024/02] | C01B25/45, H01B13/00, H01M10/0562 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/02] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SULFID-FESTELEKTROLYTEN | [2024/02] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING SULFIDE SOLID ELECTROLYTE | [2024/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN ÉLECTROLYTE SOLIDE AU SULFURE | [2024/02] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2023 | Translation filed | 22.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2023 | Search fee paid | 22.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.08.2023 | Examination requested [2024/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YX]JP2016062709 (FURUKAWA CO LTD); | [Y]WO2020095937 (MITSUI MINING & SMELTING CO [JP]) | by applicant | WO2020203224 |