EP4303006 - PRETREATMENT LIQUID FOR INKJET PRINTING, INK SET, AND PRINTING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | 10.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Kayaku Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 102-8172 / JP | [2024/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITO, Ryutaro Tokyo 115-8588 / JP | 02 /
HIGUCHI, Hiroko Tokyo 115-8588 / JP | 03 /
TERANISHI, Makoto Tokyo 115-8588 / JP | 04 /
KUROIWA, Hayato Tokyo 115-8588 / JP | [2024/02] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2024/02] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 22763445.8 | 04.03.2022 | [2024/02] | WO2022JP09566 | Priority number, date | JP20210033998 | 04.03.2021 Original published format: JP 2021033998 | [2024/02] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022186395 | Date: | 09.09.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4303006 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 09.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/01, C09D11/30, C09D11/54, B41M5/00, D06P5/00, D06P5/30 | [2024/02] | CPC: |
C09D11/54 (EP,US);
B41J3/4078 (US);
B41M5/0011 (US);
B41M5/0047 (US);
C09D11/102 (EP,US);
C09D11/107 (EP,US);
C09D11/322 (EP);
C09D11/40 (EP,US);
D06P1/445 (EP);
D06P1/5221 (EP);
D06P1/525 (EP,US);
D06P1/5278 (EP,US);
D06P1/54 (EP);
D06P3/52 (EP,US);
D06P3/60 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/02] | Title | German: | VORBEHANDLUNGSFLÜSSIGKEIT FÜR TINTENSTRAHLDRUCK, TINTENSATZ UND DRUCKVERFAHREN | [2024/02] | English: | PRETREATMENT LIQUID FOR INKJET PRINTING, INK SET, AND PRINTING METHOD | [2024/02] | French: | LIQUIDE DE PRÉTRAITEMENT POUR IMPRESSION À JET D'ENCRE, JEU D'ENCRES ET PROCÉDÉ D'IMPRESSION | [2024/02] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2023 | Translation filed | 30.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2023 | Search fee paid | 30.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2023 | Examination requested [2024/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AX]WO2008018406 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS [JP], et al) [A] 3-4, 8, 11 [X] 1-2, 5-7, 9-10, 12-13; | [A]JP2019131919 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 1-13 * entire text *; | [A]US2019257030 (CHEN CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * entire text *; | [A]JP2019157071 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 1-13 * entire text *; | [PA]JP2021154701 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [PA] 1-13* entire text * |