EP4301907 - A PROCESS TO PROTECT LIGHT METAL SUBSTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | 03.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cirrus Materials Science Limited 5b Target Court Wairau Valley Auckland, 0627 / NZ | [2024/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOODE, Christopher William Auckland / NZ | 02 /
HOU, Fengyan Auckland / NZ | [2024/02] | Representative(s) | Stolmár & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Blumenstraße 17 80331 München / DE | [2024/02] | Application number, filing date | 22763672.7 | 02.03.2022 | [2024/02] | WO2022NZ50024 | Priority number, date | US202163155708P | 02.03.2021 Original published format: US 202163155708 P | US202163237518P | 26.08.2021 Original published format: US 202163237518 P | [2024/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022186706 | Date: | 09.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4301907 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 09.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C25D11/30, C25D11/26, C25D11/06, C25D11/02 | [2024/02] | CPC: |
C25D11/026 (EP,AU,KR);
C25D11/16 (EP,KR,US);
C25D11/06 (EP,AU,KR);
C25D11/10 (US);
C25D11/26 (EP,AU,KR);
C25D11/30 (EP,AU,KR,US);
H05K1/05 (AU)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/02] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM SCHUTZ VON LEICHTMETALLSUBSTRATEN | [2024/02] | English: | A PROCESS TO PROTECT LIGHT METAL SUBSTRATES | [2024/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PROTECTION DE SUBSTRATS MÉTALLIQUES LÉGERS | [2024/02] | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2023 | Search fee paid | 02.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/02] | 22.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]TW201413063 (UNIV NAT PINGTUNG SCI & TECH [TW]); | [Y]CN105714354 (NANJING INST TECHNOLOGY); | [A]CN110129858 (BEIJING INST PETROCHEM TECH); | [A]CN110408975 (HUAFU PRECISION TECH MAANSHAN CO LTD); | [X]CN110685000 (UNIV PEKING SHENZHEN GRADUATE SCHOOL); | [X]CN111318431 (UNIV DALIAN MARITIME); | [XY]CN112251651 (ANHUI INST INFORMATION TECH) |