EP4301486 - DEVICE TO CONVERT WASTE RESIN INTO A SOLID FORM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | 03.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oddbox Holdings Inc. Dba Onulis and Purple Platypus 16842 Hale Ave Irvine, CA 92608 / US | [2024/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SWART, Mark, Andrew Irvine, CA 92606 / US | 02 /
WILLIAMS, Cameron Irvine, CA 92606 / US | [2024/02] | Representative(s) | Schlee, Alexander Richard Schlee IP International Maximilianstraße 33 80539 München / DE | [2024/02] | Application number, filing date | 22763752.7 | 16.02.2022 | [2024/02] | WO2022US16631 | Priority number, date | US202163155632P | 02.03.2021 Original published format: US 202163155632 P | US202263297616P | 07.01.2022 Original published format: US 202263297616 P | [2024/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022186985 | Date: | 09.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4301486 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B01D21/00, B05B5/16, B05B12/08, B09B3/20, B29C64/264, B29C64/35, B41J2/17 | [2024/02] | CPC: |
B09B3/20 (EP);
C08J11/06 (US);
B29C64/35 (EP);
B33Y40/00 (EP);
Y02W30/62 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/02] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR UMWANDLUNG VON ABFALLHARZ IN EINE FESTE FORM | [2024/02] | English: | DEVICE TO CONVERT WASTE RESIN INTO A SOLID FORM | [2024/02] | French: | DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE CONVERTIR UNE RÉSINE USAGÉE EN UNE FORME SOLIDE | [2024/02] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2023 | Search fee paid | 31.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.08.2023 | Examination requested [2024/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4675140 (SPARKS ROBERT E [US], et al); | [A]US5370234 (SOMMER JR EDWARD J [US], et al); | [A]US5625398 (MILKOVITS JOSEPH P [US], et al); | [A]US2003066296 (NIECHCIAL ROMAN [CA], et al); | [Y]US2005203202 (WEINE RAMSEY SALLY J [US]) |